Accounts and annual returns EAST DURHAM COMMUNITY TRANSPORT COMMITTEE

Charity Number: 1035838
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 07 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 29 May 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 21 November 2007 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 29 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 23 November 2006 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 23 November 2006 23 days late
Annual return 31 December 2004 22 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 22 June 2005 On Time