Accounts and annual returns BURSTALL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1035879
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2007 18 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 15 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 18 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required