Financial history MEVAGISSEY 'LITTLE NIPPERS' PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1036077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £106.81k £70.47k £80.92k £89.09k £97.77k
Total expenditure £83.69k £100.57k £92.23k £82.73k £135.02k
Income from government contracts N/A £300 £200 £70.71k £75.86k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A