Financial history SOUTHWARK TURKISH EDUCATION GROUP

Charity number: 1036107
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £20.78k £24.42k £16.61k £7.25k £1.47k
Total expenditure £19.41k £11.94k £21.24k £8.23k £7.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A