Financial history SUTTON HIGH SCHOOL PARENT/STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036113
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012
Total gross income £20.47k £19.70k £18.09k £4.82k £4.42k
Total expenditure £12.89k £13.34k £11.80k £3.42k £3.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A