Financial history FRIENDS OF SPRINGMEAD SURGERY

Charity number: 1036174
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £1.62k £619 £78 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.48k £2.31k £681 £1.25k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A