Financial history LITTLE JOHN'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1036192
Charity reporting is overdue by 325 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £90.62k £111.92k £100.05k £107.73k £88.15k
Total expenditure £77.21k £99.83k £108.63k £117.56k £91.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £86.05k
Income from government grants £70.49k £87.53k £88.56k £97.21k N/A