Financial history 1ST LINGWOOD AND STRUMPSHAW AIR SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1036300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £14.82k £12.51k £8.14k £8.43k £12.32k
Total expenditure £15.09k £5.01k £9.07k £14.12k £8.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.59k N/A N/A N/A