Financial history CLAVERING AND ARKESDEN PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1036426
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2004 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009
Total gross income £21.00k £32.22k £28.55k £40.55k £55.78k
Total expenditure £24.00k £24.27k £28.74k £39.04k £51.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A