Accounts and annual returns HILL BILLIES PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1036547
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2005 24 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 24 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 28 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 17 October 2005 On Time