Financial history COCK ROBIN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1036596
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £38.10k £34.44k £43.40k £42.91k £36.96k
Total expenditure £41.13k £38.20k £49.34k £39.31k £39.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £28.95k £31.85k £22.95k