Financial history ALL SAINTS PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1036614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £109.04k £100.87k £91.63k £80.32k £68.28k
Total expenditure £82.43k £88.15k £90.53k £98.87k £84.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £6.25k N/A
Income from government grants £6.25k £25.00k £9.26k N/A £5.25k