Financial history THE CHURCH HALL PLAYGROUP (BISHOP'S WALTHAM)

Charity number: 1036696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £110.17k £121.62k £157.57k £185.72k £203.56k
Total expenditure £116.22k £119.19k £139.34k £180.01k £211.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £151.33k £167.53k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £970 N/A