Accounts and annual returns WILCO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1037047
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 21 November 2013 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 19 March 2013 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required