Accounts and annual returns YORK AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 1037082
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 April 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2010 07 July 2011 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2009 23 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2008 06 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not Required