Accounts and annual returns THUNDERSLEY VILLAGE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1037147
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 October 2008 28 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2007 04 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2006 11 June 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2005 31 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2004 24 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2004 Not Required