Financial history COGGES UNDER FIVES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1037157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £102.96k £95.71k £105.89k £115.89k £122.05k
Total expenditure £95.46k £93.33k £99.56k £105.87k £113.33k
Income from government contracts £91.30k N/A £87.46k £103.76k £104.32k
Income from government grants N/A £89.70k £1.05k N/A N/A