Trustees FRIENDS OF GRUNDISBURGH SCHOOL
Charity number: 1037165
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Shemmings | Chair | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Mitchell | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kristy White | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Graham Wilson | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann Cavanagh | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Warren | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.