Financial history CHILDREN TODAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1037402
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 30/09/2010
Total gross income £720.26k £724.76k £655.39k £635.01k £997.23k
Total expenditure £642.73k £669.94k £788.36k £668.66k £979.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £300.88k £317.84k £495.51k £746.66k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £416.42k £328.87k £136.83k £250.40k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £7.46k £8.68k £2.67k £169
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £141.55k £169.86k £287.15k £381.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £67.08k £72.65k £30.08k £46.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0