Accounts and annual returns THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF HALIFAX BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1037639
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 May 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 17 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 07 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required