Accounts and annual returns TOTTERNHOE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1037665
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2014 09 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 05 February 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2013 03 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 17 October 2013 On Time