Financial history EMMER GREEN PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1037709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £42.75k £22.10k £0 £20.70k £18.18k
Total expenditure £16.79k £7.85k £0 £4.32k £261
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A