Financial history PRINCEFIELD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1038045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.01k £101 £327 £12.58k £15.73k
Total expenditure £4.33k £887 £1.26k £4.95k £19.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A