Accounts and annual returns THE CLINICAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1038148
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 June 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 07 October 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 22 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 24 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required