Financial history NORTH BRIXTON ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1038168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £20.00k £22.50k £23.50k £24.00k £131.19k
Total expenditure £18.00k £20.00k £21.00k £21.30k £45.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A