Accounts and annual returns THE ADOOR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1038258
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 February 2018 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 June 2017 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required