Financial history NO. 20 DISTRICT INNER WHEEL COMMITTEE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 1038287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.00k £1.24k £5.51k £5.45k £2.88k
Total expenditure £8.74k £1.75k £5.88k £2.28k £6.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A