Accounts and annual returns THE THOMAS MORE PICTURE TRUST

Charity number: 1038354
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 15 January 2014 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 20 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required