Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF PETERBOROUGH ORTONS TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1038363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £12.39k £13.02k £11.72k £16.19k £16.83k
Total expenditure £12.74k £12.30k £13.80k £14.05k £14.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A