Financial history ST MARYS R C V A PRIMARY SCHOOL (LOWESTOFT) PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1038716
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £10.25k £5.07k £1.93k £347 £1.25k
Total expenditure £5.10k £4.16k £6.87k £2.61k £5.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A