Accounts and annual returns TEARS TO SMILES

Charity number: 1038758
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 07 February 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2011 28 February 2013 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 28 February 2013 120 days late
Annual return 31 December 2010 25 November 2011 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 21 November 2011 21 days late