Financial history KING'S CHURCH (KESWICK)

Charity number: 1038793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £58.88k £55.55k £50.02k £66.17k £66.97k
Total expenditure £56.47k £53.82k £58.31k £51.41k £45.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A