Financial history FRIENDS OF SPROWSTON JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1038886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/09/2019 28/09/2020 28/09/2021 28/09/2022 28/09/2023
Total gross income £13.49k £7.74k £3.20k £4.09k £4.87k
Total expenditure £7.45k £5.04k £1.98k £2.51k £2.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A