Accounts and annual returns HOLY CROSS PRE-SCHOOL GROUP

Charity number: 1038931
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2007 27 October 2008 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 28 July 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2006 15 August 2007 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 15 August 2007 46 days late