Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE WHARF NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1038985
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2013 30 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2012 09 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2011 27 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not Required