Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF OXFORD ISIS TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1038992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £35.69k £13.92k £33.63k £26.80k £27.69k
Total expenditure £36.36k £19.01k £31.33k £27.41k £26.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A