Accounts and annual returns ROTARACT CLUB OF ILKLEY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1039011
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2009 26 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2008 06 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2007 14 May 2008 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not Required