Accounts and annual returns THE ST. LAWRENCE LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1039191
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 20 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 10 October 2017 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2015 24 March 2016 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2014 22 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2014 Not Required