Financial history CANTATE YOUTH CHOIR

Charity Number: 1039369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £30.59k £21.27k £20.59k £21.77k £25.91k
Total expenditure £36.46k £21.36k £20.18k £31.81k £16.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A