Financial history GAYTON GOSLINGS DAYCARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1039558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £142.57k £142.57k £146.11k £156.70k £225.18k
Total expenditure £134.40k £132.15k £141.84k £156.44k £317.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A