Financial history SHRI RADHE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1039725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.16k £35.14k £6.32k £200 £57.25k
Total expenditure £11.79k £28.97k £5.06k £0 £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A