Financial history LIVERPOOL LEARNING DIFFERENCE ATHLETICS

Charity number: 1039736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £1.40k £900 £0 £2.00k £950
Total expenditure £1.40k £876 £15 £2.17k £15
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A