Accounts and annual returns NATIONAL CENTRE FOR ENGLISH MUSIC

Charity number: 1039751
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 01 June 2009 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 30 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 02 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required