Accounts and annual returns THE SELNEC ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN'S CLUBS

Charity Number: 1040003
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 19 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 15 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 26 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required