Trustees BRISLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1040289
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Natalie Oatham Trustee 07 April 2025
None on record
Jeannie Margaret Leatherbarrow Trustee 11 October 2024
None on record
Faith Dewhurst Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Mrs C Abel Trustee 07 January 2018
None on record
DAVE PEARSON Trustee 12 January 2016
None on record