Financial history GWAENYNOG COUNTRY SHOW

Charity Number: 1040300
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011
Total gross income £7.98k £9.49k £8.94k £12.09k £11.28k
Total expenditure £6.52k £7.98k £7.44k £8.82k £11.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A