Financial history THE ROYAL NAVAL PRE SCHOOL LEARNING ORGANISATION [WESTERN AREA]

Charity number: 1040329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £488.22k £462.63k £413.76k £463.44k £529.98k
Total expenditure £443.30k £438.25k £438.43k £493.27k £526.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £385.01k £372.36k £263.24k £241.76k £310.74k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £311.24k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £216.62k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.13k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £526.55k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £26
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0