Financial history SUNBEAMS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1040398
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014
Total gross income £76.04k £84.46k £91.17k £95.12k £94.86k
Total expenditure £82.18k £81.19k £81.66k £83.33k £88.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A