Financial history CITY OF WELLS ALMSHOUSES

Charity Number: 1040554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £286.97k £293.31k £281.89k £496.28k £320.31k
Total expenditure £273.97k £205.42k £222.78k £256.37k £279.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.05k N/A £5.41k £9.60k