Financial history HULL FEDERATION OF COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS

Charity number: 1040611
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £2.61k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £10.89k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A